TX HB3194 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to coverage for diagnostic mammography under certain health benefit plans.
Title
Relating to coverage for diagnostic mammography under certain health benefit plans.
Sponsors
Rep. Diego Bernal [D] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] | Rep. Sergio Munoz [D] | Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] |
Rep. Robert Guerra [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-11 | House | Filed |