TX HB3193 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to consideration of location of an offeror's principal place of business in awarding certain municipal contracts.
Title
Relating to consideration of location of an offeror's principal place of business in awarding certain municipal contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-29 - House - HB 3193Third Reading House (Y: 96 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - HB 3193Third Reading House (Y: 96 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - HB 3193Third Reading House (Y: 108 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - HB 3193Third Reading House (Y: 96 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - HB 3193Third Reading House (Y: 108 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-20 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-29 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-29 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-29 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed |
2015-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-29 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2015-04-29 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-29 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2015-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-23 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2015-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local
City Government--General
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local