TX HB3180 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Summary
Relating to the licensing and regulation of commercial dog and cat breeders and the regulation of dog and cat dealers; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to the licensing and regulation of commercial dog and cat breeders and the regulation of dog and cat dealers; providing penalties.
Sponsors
Rep. David Leibowitz [D] | Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D] | Rep. Patrick Rose [D] |
Rep. Ed Thompson [R] | Sen. John Whitmire [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-05-13 | Read first time | |
2009-05-13 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-13 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-12 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-12 | Record vote | |
2009-05-12 | Passed | |
2009-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-12 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-12 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-12 | Amended | |
2009-05-12 | Amended | |
2009-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-08 | Corrected comm. rept. sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-08 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | |
2009-05-08 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-07 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-05 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-05 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-05 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-05 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-05 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-04-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1910 (Same As) 2009-03-24 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
Animals
COMMERCIAL DOG & CAT BREEDERS & DEALERS ACT
DOG & CAT BREEDERS ADVISORY COMMITTEE
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
COMMERCIAL DOG & CAT BREEDERS & DEALERS ACT
DOG & CAT BREEDERS ADVISORY COMMITTEE
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed