TX HB3177 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the delegation of matters to the executive director of the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the delegation of matters to the executive director of the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-21 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1517 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-22HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-21SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-21HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-21HouseRecord vote
2017-05-21HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-20HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-20HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-19HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenatePassed
2017-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-18SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-18SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-09SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2017-05-09SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-04HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-02HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-27HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-30HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2017-03-30HouseRead first time
2017-03-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3177
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03177I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03177H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03177E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03177S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03177F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3177&RcdVtNo=735&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-19-F.PDF#page=28
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-19-F.PDF#page=29
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3177&RcdVtNo=1517&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2017

Bill Comments

feedback