TX HB3177 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the transfer of certain alcoholic beverages between certain permitted premises.
Title
Relating to the transfer of certain alcoholic beverages between certain permitted premises.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Thompson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-08 | Withdrawn from schedule | |
2009-04-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |