TX HB3169 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the operation and administration of the Texas Bullion Depository, to depository agents, to the appropriation of money from the fees, charges, penalties, and other amounts related to the depository and deposited to the general revenue fund for that purpose, and to the provision of a related ad valorem tax exemption.
Title
Relating to the operation and administration of the Texas Bullion Depository, to depository agents, to the appropriation of money from the fees, charges, penalties, and other amounts related to the depository and deposited to the general revenue fund for that purpose, and to the provision of a related ad valorem tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-01 | House | Corrected comm. rept. sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-01 | House | Corrected comm. report distributed |
2017-05-01 | House | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator |
2017-05-01 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-20 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Investments & Financial Services |
2017-03-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR113 (Enabling for) 2017-05-18 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
COINS & PRECIOUS METALS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
FINANCE COMMISSION OF TEXAS
Financial
Financial--General
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
TEXAS BULLION DEPOSITORY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
FINANCE COMMISSION OF TEXAS
Financial
Financial--General
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
TEXAS BULLION DEPOSITORY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER