TX HB3167 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the abolishment of the state regulation of talent agencies and personnel services.
Title
Relating to the abolishment of the state regulation of talent agencies and personnel services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-25 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-24 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Passed | |
2011-05-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-24 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-24 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-18 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-17 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-16 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2011-05-16 | Read first time | |
2011-05-16 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-15 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-13 | Record vote | |
2011-05-13 | Passed | |
2011-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-13 | Rules suspended | |
2011-05-12 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-10 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-04 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-04 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-27 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-27 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-27 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-27 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2011-04-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-07 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |
Subjects
INTERIOR DESIGNERS
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
TALENT AGENCIES
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
TALENT AGENCIES