TX HB3150 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-11 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-11 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a merchant allowing a person suspected of committing or attempting to commit theft to complete a theft education program.
Title
Relating to a merchant allowing a person suspected of committing or attempting to commit theft to complete a theft education program.
Sponsors
Rep. Dewayne Burns [R] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. Terry Canales [D] | Rep. Shawn Thierry [D] |
Rep. James White [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - Laid out as postponed business RV#1065 (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-09 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-08 | House | Amended |
2017-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2017-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Business & Commerce--General
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General