TX HB3136 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Relating to the creation of the Windsor Hills Municipal Management District No. 1; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to the creation of the Windsor Hills Municipal Management District No. 1; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments.


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1848 (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1358 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]


2017-06-12 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-12 Filed without the Governor's signature
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-25HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-25HouseRecord vote
2017-05-25HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-24HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-24HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-24HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-23SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-21SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-19SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2017-05-19SenateRead first time
2017-05-19SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-19HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-19HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-19HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-19HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-06HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-04HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-24HouseRecommendations filed with the Speaker
2017-03-29HouseReferred to Special Purpose Districts
2017-03-29HouseRead first time
2017-03-14HouseTransmitted to the Governor


Texas State Sources

Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3136&RcdVtNo=1358&Ch=H&Dt=05/19/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3136&RcdVtNo=1848&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=4

Bill Comments