TX HB3124 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-26 - Returned to the Senate for further action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-26 - Returned to the Senate for further action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain physician-specific comparison data compiled by a health benefit plan issuer, including the release of that data to physicians participating in certain physician-led organizations.
Title
Relating to certain physician-specific comparison data compiled by a health benefit plan issuer, including the release of that data to physicians participating in certain physician-led organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - FA3 Taylor of Galveston (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#901 (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - FA3 Taylor of Galveston (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#901 (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | House | Returned to the Senate for further action |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-06 | House | Passed |
2017-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2017-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |