TX HB3117 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the possession, custody, or control of a cougar, bobcat, or coyote.
Title
Relating to the possession, custody, or control of a cougar, bobcat, or coyote.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Homer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-16 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |