TX HB3113 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the county in which a person may apply for the registration of and title for a motor vehicle.
Title
Relating to the county in which a person may apply for the registration of and title for a motor vehicle.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Thompson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-13 | House | Companion considered in lieu of CSSB 876 |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB876 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . March 1, 2022
Subjects
COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTORS
MOTOR VEHICLE DEALERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
MOTOR VEHICLE DEALERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration