TX HB3107 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to election practices and procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to election practices and procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1678 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#887 (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1678
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenatePassed
2021-05-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateAmended
2021-05-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA3 Springer
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateAmended
2021-05-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Zaffirini
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateAmended
2021-05-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Zaffirini
2021-05-26SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-26SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-22SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-22SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-13SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#887
2021-05-07HousePassed
2021-05-07HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-07HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-07HouseAmendment withdrawn 2-Raymond
2021-05-07HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2021-05-07HouseVote reconsidered
2021-05-07HouseVote reconsidered
2021-05-07HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-07HouseAmended 2-Raymond
2021-05-07HouseAmended 1-Morales Shaw
2021-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-14HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-19HouseReferred to Elections
2021-03-19HouseRead first time
2021-03-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3107
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03107I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03107H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03107E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03107S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03107F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03107H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03107H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03107S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03107S2F2.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03107S2F3.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03107I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03107H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03107H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03107E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03107E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03107S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03107S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03107F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3107&RcdVtNo=887&Ch=H&Dt=05/07/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3107&RcdVtNo=1678&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=105

Bill Comments

feedback