TX HB31 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of groundwater.
Title
Relating to the regulation of groundwater.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#391 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-25 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed |
2017-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
PERMITS
PUBLIC NOTICE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
WATER
Water--General
PUBLIC NOTICE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
WATER
Water--General