TX HB3075 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the collection and reporting of certain information regarding mental health jail diversion.
Title
Relating to the collection and reporting of certain information regarding mental health jail diversion.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1844 (Same As) 2021-03-26 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
PEACE OFFICERS
RESTRAINTS
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
PEACE OFFICERS
RESTRAINTS