TX HB3061 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an interim study regarding the method by which certain trial and appellate judges are selected.
Title
Relating to an interim study regarding the method by which certain trial and appellate judges are selected.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Judges
Governor
Interim Studies
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
STATE BAR OF TEXAS
SUPREME COURT
TEXAS INTERIM COMMISSION ON JUDICIAL SELECTION
Courts--Judges
Governor
Interim Studies
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
STATE BAR OF TEXAS
SUPREME COURT
TEXAS INTERIM COMMISSION ON JUDICIAL SELECTION