TX HB3053 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Withdrawn from schedule
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Withdrawn from schedule
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to complaints against a law enforcement officer or fire fighter.
Title
Relating to complaints against a law enforcement officer or fire fighter.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2015-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-09 | House | No action taken in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to Emerging Issues In Texas Law Enforcement, Select |
2015-03-24 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Law Enforcement
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Law Enforcement
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB3053 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB03053I.htm |