TX HB3046 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 59-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the identification of and prohibited cooperation by state and local entities with certain federal acts that violate the United States Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the identification of and prohibited cooperation by state and local entities with certain federal acts that violate the United States Constitution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#736 (Y: 95 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Amended RV#710 (Y: 83 N: 61 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-21SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-05-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#736
2021-05-05HousePassed
2021-05-05HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#710
2021-05-04HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-04HouseAmended 2-J. Turner
2021-05-04HouseAmended 1-Middleton
2021-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-22HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-22HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-19HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-19HouseRead first time
2021-03-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1248 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3046
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03046I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03046H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03046E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03046S.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03046H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03046H22.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03046I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03046H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03046E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03046E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3046&RcdVtNo=710&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3046&RcdVtNo=736&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback