TX HB3021 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to sales and use tax revenue of municipalities that adopt budgets that defund municipal police departments.
Title
Relating to sales and use tax revenue of municipalities that adopt budgets that defund municipal police departments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
County Government
County Government--Finance
CRIMINAL JUSTICE DIVISION, GOVERNOR'S OFFICE
Governor
Law Enforcement
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
City Government--Finance
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
County Government
County Government--Finance
CRIMINAL JUSTICE DIVISION, GOVERNOR'S OFFICE
Governor
Law Enforcement
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF