TX HB3021 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to informing the public about the availability of provisions in protective orders, including provisions regarding pets and other companion animals.
Title
Relating to informing the public about the availability of provisions in protective orders, including provisions regarding pets and other companion animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1258 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-10 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1258 |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-10 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-10 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-07 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-06 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-06 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Animals
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Courts
Courts--Judges
Courts--Prosecuting Attorneys
Family
Family--Family Violence
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
STATE BAR OF TEXAS
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Courts
Courts--Judges
Courts--Prosecuting Attorneys
Family
Family--Family Violence
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
STATE BAR OF TEXAS