TX HB302 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 64-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the carrying, storage, or possession of a firearm or firearm ammunition by certain persons on certain residential or commercial property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the carrying, storage, or possession of a firearm or firearm ammunition by certain persons on certain residential or commercial property.

Sponsors

Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Phil King [R]
Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]
Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]
Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. John Cyrier [R]
Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. James Frank [R]
Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]
Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]
Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]
Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]
Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]
Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]
Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]
Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]
Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]
Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. James White [R]
Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. William Zedler [R]Sen. Bryan Hughes [R]

Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#297 (Y: 101 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-05-16 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-06 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-06SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-06HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-03HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-02HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-02SenateRecord vote
2019-05-02SenatePassed
2019-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenateRecord vote
2019-05-02SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-02SenateRecord vote
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-02SenateRecord vote
2019-05-02SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-29SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-29SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-29SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-25SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-25SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-15SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-15SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-11HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-11HouseRecord vote RV#297
2019-04-11HousePassed
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-10HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2019-04-10HouseAmended 1-Paul
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-13HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB472 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB19 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Not again placed on intent calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback