TX HB3016 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the carrying of a handgun by a license holder in a motor vehicle.
Title
Relating to the carrying of a handgun by a license holder in a motor vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1002 (Y: 94 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#952 (Y: 87 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#952 (Y: 87 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#1002 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#952 |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-02 | House | Amendment withdrawn 1-Lang |
2019-05-02 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2 |
2019-05-02 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-Lang |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |