TX HB3016 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the eligibility of a criminal defendant for an order of nondisclosure of criminal history record information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the eligibility of a criminal defendant for an order of nondisclosure of criminal history record information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1784 (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#595 (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-22HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenatePassed
2017-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateAmended
2017-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-09SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-05-09SenateRead first time
2017-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-02HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-02HouseRecord vote
2017-05-02HousePassed
2017-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-01HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-01HouseAmended
2017-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-01HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-28HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-27HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-03-27HouseRead first time
2017-03-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback