TX HB3016 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to fingerprints collected by the Texas Department of Public Safety from an applicant for a driver's license or personal identification certificate and used for the department's image verification system.
Title
Relating to fingerprints collected by the Texas Department of Public Safety from an applicant for a driver's license or personal identification certificate and used for the department's image verification system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BIOMETRIC IDENTIFIERS & VOICEPRINTS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB3016 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB03016I.htm |