TX HB3013 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to displays and exhibits located on the grounds of the Alamo complex.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to displays and exhibits located on the grounds of the Alamo complex.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1099 (Y: 123 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - Amended RV#1079 (Y: 124 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - 1-Leach, et al. RV#1078 (Y: 110 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-17SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-14HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1099
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-13HouseRecord vote RV#1079
2021-05-13HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-13HouseAmended 8-Leach, Hefner, Shaheen, Patterson, Kacal, Price, Sanford, Hull, Holland, Anderson, and Larson
2021-05-13HouseAmended 7-J.D. Johnson
2021-05-13HouseAmended 6-J.D. Johnson
2021-05-13HouseAmended 4-Gervin-Hawkins
2021-05-13HouseAmendment to amendment withdrawn 5-Biedermann
2021-05-13HouseAmendment(s) offered 4-Gervin-Hawkins
2021-05-13HouseAmended 3-Gervin-Hawkins
2021-05-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-13HouseRecord vote RV#1078
2021-05-13HouseAmended 2-Gervin-Hawkins, Pacheco, Cortez, Bernal, Larson, Martinez Fischer, Minjarez, Allison, and Campos
2021-05-13HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Leach, et al.
2021-05-13HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2021-05-13HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Leach, Shaheen, K. King, Goldman, Hefner, Sanford, Holland, Canales, Patterson, Kacal, More
2021-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-26HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-19HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2021-03-19HouseRead first time
2021-03-05HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3013
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03013I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03013H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03013E.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03013H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03013H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03013H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03013H24.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03013H25.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03013H26.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03013H27.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03013H28.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03013I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03013H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03013H.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3013&RcdVtNo=1078&Ch=H&Dt=05/13/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3013&RcdVtNo=1079&Ch=H&Dt=05/13/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3013&RcdVtNo=1099&Ch=H&Dt=05/14/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback