TX HB3003 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sales and use tax exemption for the repair, remodeling, or maintenance of aircraft.
Title
Relating to the sales and use tax exemption for the repair, remodeling, or maintenance of aircraft.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2023-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1022 (Same As) 2023-05-02 - Co-author authorized
SB1022 (Same As) 2023-05-02 - Co-author authorized
SB1022 (Same As) 2023-05-02 - Co-author authorized