TX HB300 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the allocation to the Parks and Wildlife Department of the proceeds from taxes imposed on the sale, storage, or use of sporting goods.
Title
Relating to the allocation to the Parks and Wildlife Department of the proceeds from taxes imposed on the sale, storage, or use of sporting goods.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Gonzales [R] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Linda Koop [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] |
Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - SUSPEND ALL NECESSARY RULES (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2015-05-08 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2015-05-07 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-07 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-04 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-04 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-01 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--General
SPORTING GOODS
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--General
SPORTING GOODS
Taxation
Taxation--Sales