TX HB300 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the privacy of protected health information; providing administrative, civil, and criminal penalties.
Title
Relating to the privacy of protected health information; providing administrative, civil, and criminal penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-30 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-28 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-27 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-27 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2011-05-26 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-26 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-26 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-26 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-26 | House requests conference committee | |
2011-05-26 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-24 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Passed | |
2011-05-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-24 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-24 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-19 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-17 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-09 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2011-05-09 | Read first time | |
2011-05-05 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-05 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-04 | Record vote | |
2011-05-04 | Passed | |
2011-05-04 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-03 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-03 | Amended | |
2011-05-03 | Amended | |
2011-05-03 | Amended | |
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-28 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-05 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-04 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-24 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-24 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-16 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-16 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-16 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to Public Health | |
2011-02-22 | Read first time | |
2011-02-14 | Filed |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Electronic Information Systems
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Privacy/Use of Information
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Protection of Personal Information
TEXAS HEALTH SERVICES AUTHORITY
Electronic Information Systems
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Privacy/Use of Information
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Protection of Personal Information
TEXAS HEALTH SERVICES AUTHORITY