TX HB3 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 60-0)
Status: Introduced on August 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-23 - Referred to Constitutional Rights & Remedies
Pending: House Constitutional Rights & Remedies Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-23 - Referred to Constitutional Rights & Remedies
Pending: House Constitutional Rights & Remedies Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to election integrity and security, including by preventing fraud in the conduct of elections in this state; increasing criminal penalties; creating criminal offenses.
Title
Relating to election integrity and security, including by preventing fraud in the conduct of elections in this state; increasing criminal penalties; creating criminal offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-23 | House | Referred to Constitutional Rights & Remedies |
2021-08-23 | House | Read first time |
2021-08-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1 (Similar To) 2021-09-07 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . December 2, 2021
SB1 (Similar To) 2021-09-07 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . December 2, 2021
SB1 (Similar To) 2021-09-07 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . December 2, 2021
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Appellate
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
ELECTION INTEGRITY PROTECTION ACT OF 2021
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Early Voting
Elections--Election Officers
Elections--General
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
Elections--Voting Systems
FRAUD
SECRETARY OF STATE
SUPREME COURT
Courts--Appellate
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
ELECTION INTEGRITY PROTECTION ACT OF 2021
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Early Voting
Elections--Election Officers
Elections--General
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
Elections--Voting Systems
FRAUD
SECRETARY OF STATE
SUPREME COURT
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=HB3 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/HB00003I.htm |