TX HB2998 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to lead in drinking water at schools and child care facilities.
Title
Relating to lead in drinking water at schools and child care facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Day Care
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--Primary & Secondary--Private
Education--School Districts
Environment
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LEAD POISONING
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--Primary & Secondary--Private
Education--School Districts
Environment
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LEAD POISONING
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2998 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02998I.htm |