TX HB2997 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation and funding of the urban farming pilot program and the creation of the Select Committee on Urban Farming.
Title
Relating to the creation and funding of the urban farming pilot program and the creation of the Select Committee on Urban Farming.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-23 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-20 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-12 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | |
2011-05-12 | Read first time | |
2011-05-12 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-11 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-11 | Record vote | |
2011-05-11 | Passed | |
2011-05-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-11 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-11 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-09 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-06 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-06 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-29 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-29 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-29 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-29 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | |
2011-03-17 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |