TX HB2967 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to collection and use of certain information reported to and by the Texas Department of Insurance and certain approval authority and hearings held in connection with reported information.
Title
Relating to collection and use of certain information reported to and by the Texas Department of Insurance and certain approval authority and hearings held in connection with reported information.
Sponsors
Rep. John Frullo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2015-05-05 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-07 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-01 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--General
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--General
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB2967 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB02967I.htm |