TX HB2966 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-09 - Left pending in subcommittee
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-09 - Left pending in subcommittee
Summary
Relating to an offense committed against a person because of bias or prejudice on the basis of gender identity or expression.
Title
Relating to an offense committed against a person because of bias or prejudice on the basis of gender identity or expression.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-04-09 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-04-09 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-04-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-30 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-30 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |