TX HB2952 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to suits affecting the parent-child relationship and the calculation and enforcement of child support.
Title
Relating to suits affecting the parent-child relationship and the calculation and enforcement of child support.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-10 | House | Companion considered in lieu of CSSB 286 |
2021-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2021-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB286 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Courts
Courts--Civil Procedure
Family
Family--Child Support
Family--Parent & Child
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Courts
Courts--Civil Procedure
Family
Family--Child Support
Family--Parent & Child