TX HB2950 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Board of Nursing and to the regulation of the practice of nursing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Board of Nursing and to the regulation of the practice of nursing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-27 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1953 (Y: 134 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#646 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Amendment tabled RV#609 (Y: 114 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 See remarks for effective date
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-27HouseRecord vote
2017-05-27HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-26HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-26SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-26SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-26SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2017-05-24SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-24SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-24SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-24HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-24HouseHouse requests conference committee
2017-05-24HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2017-05-21HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-21HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-19HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenatePassed
2017-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateAmended
2017-05-19SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateAmended
2017-05-19SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateAmended
2017-05-19SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-19SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-17SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-10SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-10SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HousePassed
2017-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-02HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-02HouseAmendment adopted as amended
2017-05-02HouseAmendment amended
2017-05-02HouseAmendment amended
2017-05-02HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-02HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-02HouseRecord vote
2017-05-02HouseAmendment tabled
2017-05-02HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment)
2017-05-02HousePoint of order overruled (amendment)
2017-05-02HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-02HouseAmended
2017-05-02HouseAmended
2017-05-02HouseAmended
2017-05-02HouseAmended
2017-05-02HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-02HousePostponed
2017-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-23HouseReferred to Public Health
2017-03-23HouseRead first time
2017-03-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2950
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02950I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02950H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02950E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02950S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02950F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2950&RcdVtNo=609&Ch=H&Dt=05/02/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2950&RcdVtNo=646&Ch=H&Dt=05/03/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-19-F.PDF#page=22
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2950&RcdVtNo=1953&Ch=H&Dt=05/27/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=92

Bill Comments

feedback