TX HB295 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the adoption of noise regulations by certain counties; providing a criminal penalty; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to the adoption of noise regulations by certain counties; providing a criminal penalty; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-10 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2017-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2016-11-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Environment
Environment--Noise
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
PERMITS
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Environment
Environment--Noise
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
PERMITS