TX HB294 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to appointment of a receiver for a water or sewer utility.
Title
Relating to appointment of a receiver for a water or sewer utility.
Sponsors
Rep. Armando Walle [D] | Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R] | Rep. Harold Dutton [D] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] |
Rep. Lyle Larson [R] | Sen. Sylvia Garcia [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#476 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#476 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-05-26 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2016-11-14 | House | Filed |