TX HB2936 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain notice requirements and filing requirements in court proceedings involving persons with mental illness.
Title
Relating to certain notice requirements and filing requirements in court proceedings involving persons with mental illness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2019-04-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB395 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2936 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02936I.htm |