TX HB292 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to inclusion of instruction on the trafficking of persons in the basic training curriculum for peace officers.
Title
Relating to inclusion of instruction on the trafficking of persons in the basic training curriculum for peace officers.
Sponsors
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R] | Rep. Gina Calanni [D] | Rep. Julie Johnson [D] |
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] | Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] | Sen. Joan Huffman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Laid out as postponed business RV#1150 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Laid out as postponed business RV#1150 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#1150 |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed |
2019-05-08 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-08 | House | Postponed 5/8/19 12:00 PM |
2019-05-08 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-08 | House | Postponed 5/8/19 11:00 AM |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB3527 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
Subjects
COMMISSION ON LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Law Enforcement
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Law Enforcement
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS