TX HB2912 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Postponed 5/10/19 12:01 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Postponed 5/10/19 12:01 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain images captured by an unmanned aircraft.
Title
Relating to certain images captured by an unmanned aircraft.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Postponed 5/10/19 12:01 AM |
2019-05-09 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 10(b) |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Aeronautics
County Government
County Government--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Electronic Information Systems
County Government
County Government--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Electronic Information Systems