TX HB2908 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of an appraisal district to purchase, finance the purchase of, or lease real property or construct or finance the construction of improvements to real property.
Title
Relating to the authority of an appraisal district to purchase, finance the purchase of, or lease real property or construct or finance the construction of improvements to real property.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Murr [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#628 (Y: 127 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-27 | House | Record vote RV#628 |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed |
2023-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2023-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1349 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Local Government
SB1349 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Local Government
SB1349 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Local Government
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts