TX HB290 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-14)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the period of continuous eligibility and a periodic eligibility review for a child for Medicaid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the period of continuous eligibility and a periodic eligibility review for a child for Medicaid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#230 (Y: 130 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-05-26SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-25SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-22SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-21SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-18SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-05-18SenateRead first time
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-15HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#230
2021-04-15HousePassed
2021-04-15HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-14HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-14HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-14HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-06HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Human Services
2021-02-25HouseRead first time
2020-11-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB39 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB290
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00290I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00290H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00290E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00290S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00290I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00290H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00290H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00290E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00290E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00290S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00290S.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB290&RcdVtNo=230&Ch=H&Dt=04/15/2021

Bill Comments

feedback