TX HB290 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the punishment for the offense of employment harmful to children.
Title
Relating to the punishment for the offense of employment harmful to children.
Sponsors
Rep. Rafael Anchia [D] | Rep. Pete Gallego [D] | Rep. Jim Jackson [R] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
Rep. Randy Weber [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-27 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-27 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-27 | Record vote | |
2011-05-27 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-25 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-25 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-23 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-23 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-04-28 | Read first time | |
2011-04-27 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-27 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-21 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-13 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-12 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-12 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-07 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-07 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-02-15 | Read first time | |
2010-11-15 | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Labor
Labor--General
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
SEXUALLY ORIENTED BUSINESSES
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Labor
Labor--General
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
SEXUALLY ORIENTED BUSINESSES