TX HB29 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prostitution and the trafficking of persons, civil racketeering related to trafficking, the prevention, investigation, and prosecution of and punishment for certain sexual offenses and offenses involving or related to trafficking, reimbursement of certain costs for criminal victims who are children, and the release and reporting of certain information relating to a child; increasing criminal penalties; creating criminal offenses.
Title
Relating to prostitution and the trafficking of persons, civil racketeering related to trafficking, the prevention, investigation, and prosecution of and punishment for certain sexual offenses and offenses involving or related to trafficking, reimbursement of certain costs for criminal victims who are children, and the release and reporting of certain information relating to a child; increasing criminal penalties; creating criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1998 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - House requests conference committee RV#1449 (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - Amended RV#282 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1998 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - House requests conference committee RV#1449 (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - Amended RV#282 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | See remarks for effective date | |
2017-06-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-28 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-27 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-22 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-22 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-20 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-20 | House | House requests conference committee |
2017-05-20 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2017-05-18 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-18 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-18 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-19 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | House | Passed as amended |
2017-04-19 | House | Amended |
2017-04-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-18 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-04-18 | House | Amended |
2017-04-18 | House | Amended |
2017-04-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-18 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
CRIME VICTIMS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Trial
Education
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Nonpublic Schools
Education--Nonpublic Schools--Vocational/Avocational
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
HUMAN TRAFFICKING PREVENTION TASK FORCE
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
PROSTITUTION
SECRETARY OF STATE
SEXUALLY ORIENTED BUSINESSES
SUPREME COURT
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
CRIME VICTIMS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Trial
Education
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Nonpublic Schools
Education--Nonpublic Schools--Vocational/Avocational
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
HUMAN TRAFFICKING PREVENTION TASK FORCE
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
PROSTITUTION
SECRETARY OF STATE
SEXUALLY ORIENTED BUSINESSES
SUPREME COURT
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS