TX HB2898 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the definition of preventable death of a child.
Title
Relating to the definition of preventable death of a child.
Sponsors
Rep. Josey Garcia [D] | Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Campos [D] | Rep. John Lujan [R] |
Rep. Stephen Allison [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-06 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2023-05-06 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-21 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-13 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2023-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-27 | House | Filed |