TX HB2877 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-24 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-24 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to crime victims' compensation.
Title
Relating to crime victims' compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#392 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-21 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-21 | House | Record vote RV#392 |
2023-04-21 | House | Passed |
2023-04-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-20 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select |
2023-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2298 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB2298 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB2298 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
CRIME VICTIMS
Crime Victims Compensation
Family
Family--Family Violence
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
SEXUAL ASSAULT
STALKING
CRIME VICTIMS
Crime Victims Compensation
Family
Family--Family Violence
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
SEXUAL ASSAULT
STALKING