TX HB285 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Committee report distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to increasing the punishment for certain conduct constituting the criminal offense of obstruction or retaliation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to increasing the punishment for certain conduct constituting the criminal offense of obstruction or retaliation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-02-25HouseRead first time
2020-11-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback