TX HB2849 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the procedures for removing certain persons' names from the child abuse and neglect central registry.
Title
Relating to the procedures for removing certain persons' names from the child abuse and neglect central registry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-12 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2017-03-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CHILD ABUSE
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Family--Parent & Child
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Family--Parent & Child