TX HB284 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorization for certain health care facilities to secure residents with wheelchair self-release seat belts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorization for certain health care facilities to secure residents with wheelchair self-release seat belts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1851 (Y: 130 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#157 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-25SenateHouse discharges conferees-reported
2017-05-25HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-25HouseRecord vote
2017-05-25HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-25HouseHouse discharges conferees
2017-05-24SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-24SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-24SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-24HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-24HouseHouse requests conference committee
2017-05-24HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2017-05-22HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-22HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-22HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenatePassed
2017-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateAmended
2017-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-19SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-04-19SenateRead first time
2017-04-10SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-06HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-06HouseRecord vote
2017-04-06HousePassed
2017-04-06HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-05HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-05HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-03-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-03-21HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-03-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-20HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-13HouseReferred to Human Services
2017-02-13HouseRead first time
2016-11-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback