TX HB2837 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibiting a person or entity from surveilling, reporting, or tracking the purchase of firearms, ammunition, and accessories through the use of certain merchant category codes; imposing a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to prohibiting a person or entity from surveilling, reporting, or tracking the purchase of firearms, ammunition, and accessories through the use of certain merchant category codes; imposing a civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-19 - Senate - Point of order sustained (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-19 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#918 (Y: 89 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Point of order withdrawn RV#888 (Y: 85 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#887 (Y: 56 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2023-05-02 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#886 (Y: 58 N: 85 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-05-02 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#885 (Y: 63 N: 83 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-19 - Senate - Point of order sustained (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-19 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#918 (Y: 89 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Point of order withdrawn RV#888 (Y: 85 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#887 (Y: 56 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2023-05-02 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#886 (Y: 58 N: 85 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-05-02 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#885 (Y: 63 N: 83 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-10 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-19 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Point of order sustained |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Point of order |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Menéndez |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#918 |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed |
2023-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#888 |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-02 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2023-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#887 |
2023-05-02 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 3-Bryant |
2023-05-02 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 11, Section 2 |
2023-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#886 |
2023-05-02 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 2-Bryant |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#885 |
2023-05-02 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 1-Bryant |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2023-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
CREDIT & DEBIT CARDS
Financial
Financial--General
SECOND AMENDMENT FINANCIAL PRIVACY ACT
Weapons
CREDIT & DEBIT CARDS
Financial
Financial--General
SECOND AMENDMENT FINANCIAL PRIVACY ACT
Weapons